MOHANJI FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mohanji Foundation UK conducts sessions for Meditation, Yoga, prayer, healing, group discussion, retreats/one day programmes for the general public at various locations in the UK. The charity will acquire or support the acquisition of property for the above activities. It disseminates/publishes material on Mohanji's teachings and also arranges pilgrimages to places of worship worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- India
- Mauritius
- Philippines
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Slovenia
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 21 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIJAY ANAND RAMANAIDOO BSc, MSc | Chair | 01 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Michael John Draper | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Greenwood | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shyama Jeyaseelan BSc | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
VIGNESHWARAN SWAMINATHAN | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
HEMANT PANDA | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHAN PATHIRISSERI KESAVAN | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|||||
SUBHASREE THOTTUNGAL | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.34k | £22.04k | £19.19k | £775.92k | £223.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.32k | £9.74k | £22.93k | £769.63k | £244.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £192.98k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £44.93k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £538.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £42.84k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.03k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £724.77k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SANATANA DHARMA UNIVERSAL RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF BRAHMARISHI MOHANJI BY: A) CONDUCTING SERVICES (SATSANG) THAT PROMOTE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELLBEING, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PRACTICE OF MEDITATION, YOGA AND BREATHING TECHNIQUES, B) CONDUCTING CLASSES ON MEDITATION, YOGA AND BREATHING TECHNIQUES, C) PROVIDING CLASSES, PROGRAMS, SEMINARS, RETREATS, WORKSHOPS, BOOKS, VIDEOS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS, D) ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING ASHRAMS, TEMPLES, PRAYER HALLS, AND MEDITATION HALLS, E) CO-OPERATING WITH GOVERNMENT BODIES, NON-GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHARITYS OBJECTS, F) SOLICITING, COLLECTING, RECEIVING ACQUIRING, HOLDING AND INVESTING FUNDS AND PROPERTY RECEIVED BY GIFT, DONATION, CONTRIBUTION OR BEQUEST FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS, G) APPLYING THE PROCEEDS, INCOME AND RENTS DERIVED FROM ANY PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHARITYS OBJECTS, I) DOING ALL SUCH THINGS AS MAY BE NECESSARY OR CONDUCIVE TO FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY, AS PERMITTED BY THE LAWS OF ENGLAND & WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mohanji Centre of Benevolence
Smallburn
Cairnie
Huntly
Aberdeenshire
Scotland
- Phone:
- 07758287868
- Email:
- uk@mohanji.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window