Financial history CANINE CONCERN

Charity number: 1177334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £39.06k £36.26k £91.27k £68.78k £62.14k
Total expenditure £74.40k £68.12k £73.95k £86.23k £92.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A