Financial history GWEALAN TOPS ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND

Charity Number: 1177542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £161.71k £153.39k £150.74k £195.89k £222.24k
Total expenditure £131.81k £142.46k £169.78k £156.62k £208.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A £54.71k £6.52k £32.02k £86.14k