THE LANCASHIRE PARISH REGISTER SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Transcription and publication in volume form of Lancashire parish registers from the 16th,17th and early 18th centuries up to the mid 19th century. Publication of some on CDs and re-publication on CD of early volumes which are no longer available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Lancashire
Governance
- 26 May 1981: Standard registration
- LPRS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir THOMAS WOODCOCK KCVO DL | Chair |
|
||||||||
Barbara Kenwright | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
STEPHEN JOHN WARD | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jennifer Susan Holt B Sc | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MR NEIL HUDSON MA BSC ADDMS FIPD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
THE REVD THOMAS MOLYNEUX STEEL BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR KEN TAYLOR MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN DALTON BSC LRIC | Trustee |
|
||||||||
SIMON GREY OLIVER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DR JOHN PERKINS FRCP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr COLIN DARLINGTON ROGERS MA MED PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS JACKIE ROBERTS MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ALAN KENWRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.00k | £9.44k | £9.21k | £10.80k | £6.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.33k | £11.30k | £16.94k | £12.49k | £7.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 March 2021 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1897 AS AMENDED ON 4 APRIL 1981
Charitable objects
A TO TRANSCRIBE, EDIT AND PUBLISH THE REGISTERS OF THE ANCIENT PARISHES AND CHAPELRIES IN THE COUNTY PALATINE OF LANCASTER; B TO GIVE ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN THE CARE AND RESTORATION OF THE ORIGINAL RECORDS.
Area of benefit
THE FORMER COUNTY PALATINE OF LANCASTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 CORRIE DRIVE
KEARSLEY
BOLTON
BL4 8RG
- Phone:
- 01617945096
- Email:
- akenwright@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window