THAMES VIEW PTA

Charity number: 1176111
Charity reporting is up to date (171 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the association is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school; and engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £12,860
Total expenditure: £1,618

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Medway

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TANYA SILVESTER Chair 05 October 2017
None on record
Emily Millgate Trustee 02 March 2022
None on record
TANIA ELAINE CAMBURN Trustee 10 July 2019
None on record
Amy Bohan Trustee 06 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £14.85k £8.17k £3.40k £21.90k £12.86k
Total expenditure £8.76k £4.07k £5.14k £21.85k £1.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 18 November 2024 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 27 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 September 2020 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Thames View Primary School
Bloors Lane
Rainham
GILLINGHAM
ME8 7DX
Phone:
07597545664