NATIONAL NETWORK FOR THE EDUCATION OF CARE LEAVERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The National Network for the Education of Care Leavers (NNECL) is a community of professionals working together to transform the progression of care-experienced young people into and through further and higher education. NNECL provides advice, guidance and support to those who are working with care-experienced young people and care leavers to encourage the improvement of services for care leavers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 November 2018: CIO registration
- NNECL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan James Wakeford | Chair | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandhya Sabapathy | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Lavon Turner | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Mollison Benvie | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Watson | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hill | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr NEIL HARRISON | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mx ARRON ANDREW JEROME PILE | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.54k | £93.73k | £75.71k | £50.72k | £104.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.21k | £82.80k | £80.90k | £89.31k | £81.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE IN, OR HAVE SPENT SOME OR ALL OF THEIR CHILDHOOD IN, PUBLIC CARE BY:- 4.1. PROVIDING ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT AND OTHER SERVICES IN ORDER THAT SUCH PEOPLE MAY FULFIL THEIR POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS; 4.2. ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, SERVICE PROVIDERS AND THE MEDIA BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE ON THE ISSUES AFFECTING THE WELFARE OF PEOPLE IN CARE AND CARE LEAVERS WITH THE OBJECT OF REDUCING NEGATIVE STEREOTYPING AND SOCIAL EXCLUSION; 4.3. ENCOURAGING THE IMPROVEMENT OF SERVICES FOR CARE LEAVERS AND THOSE STILL IN CARE IN ORDER TO TRANSFORM THE PROGRESSION OF THOSE WITH EXPERIENCE OF BEING IN CARE INTO AND THROUGH FURTHER AND HIGHER EDUCATION SO THAT THEY THRIVE THROUGHOUT THEIR LIVES AND CAREERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clarence Centre For Enterprise
at South Bank University
6 St. Georges Circus
Elephant and Castle
London
SE1 6FE
- Phone:
- 07952817874
- Email:
- info@nnecl.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window