GIMA-HA SHISEIKAI MAIDSTONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Karate club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 26 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN EDWARDS | Chair | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
KELLY EDWARDS | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 January 2025 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 January 2025 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 January 2025 | 456 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 January 2025 | 456 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2022 | 326 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2022 | 326 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE BY THE PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION, FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND CLOTHING FOR PARTICIPATING IN KARATE OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 NORTHUMBERLAND ROAD
MAIDSTONE
ME15 7LG
- Phone:
- 07731437099
- Email:
- stevenjkakarate@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window