WEYBRIDGE WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1176986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Weybridge Women's Institute (WI) educates women for the public benefit in all areas including: 1. local, national and international issues of political and social importance; 2. music, drama and other cultural subjects; and 3. all branches of agriculture, crafts, home economics, science, health and social welfare; Meetings are 3rd Thursday of month.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £11,895
Total expenditure: £11,856

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jenny Cheetham Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Julie Ann Easton Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Carolyn Halkes Trustee 16 November 2023
None on record
Joanna McLeod Trustee 16 November 2023
None on record
Amanda Isaacs Trustee 16 November 2023
None on record
Elizabeth McAllister Trustee 16 November 2023
None on record
Sharon Lorraine Bates Trustee 30 November 2020
None on record
Dr Susanna Heidi Price Trustee 30 November 2020
None on record
LYNN WALLIS Trustee 01 December 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £8.64k £10.12k £8.91k £11.49k £11.90k
Total expenditure £11.29k £6.93k £11.84k £14.11k £11.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 24 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 20 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 06 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 31 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 03 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Otterburn
Godolphin Road
WEYBRIDGE
Surrey
KT13 0PU
Phone:
07931 174462