Financial history HIGHER POTENTIAL

Charity number: 1178146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £36.20k £46.47k £14.11k £71.43k
Total expenditure £23.83k £27.35k £46.10k £39.26k £52.54k
Income from government contracts N/A £16.20k £46.47k £8.49k £5.50k
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k N/A £0 £5.50k