CLUBS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help educate young people in Northamptonshire through their leisure time activities, so as to develop their physical, social, intellectual and spiritual capacities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society. To encourage the formation of new provisions for young people and the wider community across the county and stimulate and assist existing work, including
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,625 from 4 government contract(s) and £18,191 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 19 January 2018: CIO registration
- 06 February 2019: Funds received from 304460 CLUBS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
- CLUBS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONY JOHN PICKERING | Chair | 05 September 1988 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clare Jolley | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Keith Fletcher | Trustee | 03 September 2002 |
|
|
||||
BARRY CURTIS | Trustee | 04 September 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.27k | £47.82k | £79.39k | £48.77k | £68.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.05k | £47.15k | £62.71k | £59.89k | £72.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £51.56k | £27.44k | £33.97k | £11.21k | £23.63k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.78k | £2.92k | £1.48k | £4.54k | £18.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, SOCIAL INTELLECTUALA AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF CLUBS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND GENERALLY TO CARRY OUT IN THAT COUNTY THE OBJECTS OF A "COUNTY ASSOCIATION" IN LINE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND ETHICS OF YOUTH WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8th Earl Spencer Centre
Old Bedford Road
Northampton
Northampton
Northamptonshire
NN4 7AA
- Phone:
- 07760891181
- Email:
- gemma@cypn.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window