MUSEUMS, LIBRARIES AND ARCHIVES NORTH WEST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MLA North West is an associate of the Museums, Libraries and Archives Council and acts collaboratively for the benefit of the sector and the public, leading the transformation of museums, libraries and archives for the future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 March 1982: Standard registration
- 05 September 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MLA NORTH WEST (Working name)
- THE COUNCIL FOR MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERIES IN THE NORTH WEST (Previous name)
- THE NORTH WEST MUSEUMS, LIBRARIES AND ARCHIVES COUNCIL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.60m | £1.77m | £5.29m | £223.09k | £703 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68m | £2.03m | £856.95k | £44.19k | £2.62m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.10m | £1.06m | £575.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £449.33k | £563.08k | £370.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £10.48k | £21.03k | £6.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £36.00k | £124.00k | £4.34m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.13m | £1.52m | £845.80k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £542.74k | £502.60k | £11.15k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £65.93k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 31 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 20 July 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 18 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 04 August 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 27 July 2010 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 28 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 MARCH 1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 14 MARCH 1986, 29 NOVEMBER 1996, 1 DECEMBER 2000, 29 NOVEMBER 2002, 19 MARCH 2004, 30 JANUARY 2006, 5 NOVEMBER 2006 AND 21 JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND TO FURTHER ANY OTHER PURPOSE WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES WHICH RELATES TO THE ESTABLISHMENT, MAINTENANCE, OPERATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF MUSEUMS, ART GALLERIES, LIBRARIES AND ARCHIVES (WHICH ARE EITHER PUBLIC OR FROM WHICH THE PUBLIC MAY BENEFIT) AND RELATED SERVICES AND ACTIVITIES IN THE COUNTIES OF CHESHIRE, CUMBRIA, GREATER MANCHESTER, LANCASHIRE AND MERSEYSIDE AND IN THE ISLE OF MAN.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window