FIRST STAR SCHOLARS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
First Star improves the lives of Looked-after Children and Young People by partnering with universities and working with virtual school heads, schools and their designated teachers, social services, carers, and local authorities to ensure looked-after young people have the academic, life skills, and adult support needed to successfully transition to higher education and adulthood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 November 2018: Standard registration
- FIRST STAR ACADEMIES UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER SAMUELSON | Chair | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Gratton | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
caroline place | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Monica Henao-De-Castro | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tom Brighton | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teshie Monae | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
STUART RICHARD IRVINE | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £351.72k | £182.07k | £263.60k | £311.78k | £308.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £331.41k | £114.74k | £269.56k | £230.09k | £337.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 NOV 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 MAR 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 MAR 2018 as amended on 14 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE COMPANY ARE: (A) TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO PEOPLE IN NEED WHO ARE YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO HAVE ENTERED INTO THE SOCIAL CARE SYSTEM IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING THEM WITH ACADEMIC AND LIFE SKILLS EDUCATION AND CAREGIVER ENGAGEMENT. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN NEED WHO ARE YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO HAVE ENTERED INTO THE SOCIAL CARE SYSTEM IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING THEM WITH ACADEMIC AND LIFE SKILLS EDUCATION AND CAREGIVER ENGAGEMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Registered Office (Uk) Ltd
167-169 Great Portland Street
LONDON
W1W 5PF
- Phone:
- 07933686271
- Email:
- info@firststaruk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window