OPERATION EMOTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation Emotion is a voluntary organisation that operates, encourages and develops services for adult male survivors of sexual abuse, linking with specialist organisations where appropriate. We provide a range of self help and educational initiatives that enable men to engage in a process of recovery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 09 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Fry | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Loheac | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Warner | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUDE PETER JOHN BUTCHER | Trustee | 09 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ROBERT STEAR | Trustee | 09 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JONATHAN GREGORY TILBURY | Trustee | 09 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.35k | £70.40k | £53.64k | £152.09k | £140.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.27k | £55.61k | £58.40k | £76.41k | £96.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £57.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF MEN PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND WHO HAVE BEEN SEXUALLY ABUSED BY PROVIDING; A)WEEKLY SUPPORT GROUPS B)HELPLINE, ADVICE AND SUPPORT; C)PROMOTING EDUCATION IN SOCIETY REGARDING THE IMPACT OF SEXUAL ABUSE AND; D)OTHER SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT IN FURTHERANCE OF SAID OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pitt Farm
Albaston
GUNNISLAKE
PL18 9AD
- Phone:
- 07837 603541
- Email:
- opem@protonmail.com
- Website:
-
operationemotion.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window