THE ACOCKS GREEN CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preach the Bible Gospel message to anyone who wishes to hear. Assist with financial donations to other Christadelphian Charities and other external charities and organisations. Member contributions to local food banks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 24 September 2018: Standard registration
- ACOCKS GREEN CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA (Previous name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gabriel Bauer | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Nation | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Timothy Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Law | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WASSON | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Woodcock | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MARTIN LEGG | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.56k | £47.21k | £32.81k | £33.53k | £105.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.11k | £59.09k | £32.27k | £45.40k | £40.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 MAR 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 AUG 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTADELPHIAN STATEMENT OF FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 LINCOLN CLOSE
BIRMINGHAM
B27 6RU
- Phone:
- 01217062527
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window