Financial history THE MARTIN JAMES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1179016
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £27.12m £57.58m £59.97m £68.46m £76.66m
Total expenditure £24.97m £55.42m £58.80m £66.71m £74.53m
Income from government contracts £133.50k £283.33k £419.72k £353.70k N/A
Income from government grants £6.27m £28.70m £33.88m £34.91m £86.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.51m £968.10k £147.49k £85.31k £234.00k
Income - Other trading activities £116.78k £137.90k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £25.41m £56.45m £59.57m £68.07m £75.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22.24k £13.25k £4.73k £262.00k £535.00k
Income - Other £49.92k £7.18k £251.91k £43.27k £529.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £24.81m £55.39m £58.76m £61.83m £74.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £161.73k £0 £0 £6.01k £12.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £221.01k £249.00k £332.00k £320.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £303.02k £378.15k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £30.21k £38.25k £4.87m £62.00k