WOOLACOMBE SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB (CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO TEACH AND DEVELOP SURF LIFE SAVING SKILLS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 13 December 2017: CIO registration
- 12 January 2020: Funds received from 1035938 WOOLACOMBE SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsay Allix | Chair | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Gammon | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robbie Lamb | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
DONALD DUFFIELD | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN COOK | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Annette Deasy | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.58k | £13.85k | £39.45k | £61.97k | £81.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.07k | £20.87k | £41.80k | £60.53k | £74.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 06 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 06 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO SAVE LIFE BY PREVENTION OR RESCUE AND TO PROMOTE THE METHODS OF SURF LIFE SAVING AND FIRST AID FOR RESUSCITATION OF THE RESCUED FROM THE BEACH IN WOOLACOMBE, DEVON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 ARLINGTON PLACE
WOOLACOMBE
EX34 7BD
- Phone:
- 01271870809
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
woolacombesurflifesavingclub.org/
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window