SARASIN CHARITY AUTHORISED INVESTMENT FUNDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of Sarasin Charity Authorised Investment Funds ("the CAIF") is to further the charitable purposes of the charities that directly or indirectly hold units in the funds of the CAIF.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 December 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NatWest Trustee and Depositary Services Ltd | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
SARASIN INVESTMENT FUNDS LIMITED | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.36m | £47.05m | £47.69m | £60.35m | £72.86m | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.15m | £85.70m | £96.38m | £106.21m | £109.66m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 March 2021 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 March 2021 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07 AUG 2019 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 03 FEB 2020 as amended on 23 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
1. SUBJECT TO THE FOLLOWING CLAUSE TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITIES THAT DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY HOLD UNITS IN THE SUB-FUNDS FROM TIME TO TIME; 2. IF AT ANY TIME THERE ARE NO UNITHOLDERS IN ANY SUB-FUND, THE MANAGER AND TRUSTEE WILL DETERMINE THE TRUST'S CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SARASIN INVESTMENT FUNDS LIMITED
JUXON HOUSE
100 ST. PAUL'S CHURCHYARD
LONDON
EC4M 8BU
- Phone:
- 02070387019
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window