ALL WAYS NETWORK (AWN)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting not-for-profits with an annual income of £1 million or less working with the diverse Muslim communities living in the UK. - Activities include events, advice sessions, signposting and bid writing service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ayesha Tariq | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Faiza Ajmi | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fatma Emin | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.43k | £6.16k | £21.31k | £30.93k | £440.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £565 | £1.40k | £630 | £27.85k | £389.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES (IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION SMALL MUSLIM LED CHARITIES), AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF THEIR CHARITABLE RESOURCES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1)PROMOTING CO-OPERATION AND BUILDING RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN CHARITIES THROUGH NETWORKING EVENTS; (2)PROVIDING INFORMATION AND TRAINING THROUGH EVENTS, WORKSHOPS AND SEMINARS; (3)PROVIDING A PLATFORM FOR CHARITIES TO RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THEIR WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Capital Office
124-128 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- -
- Email:
- info@awn.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window