THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL UNITED HOSPITALS (BATH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING COMFORT AND AMENITIES AND PATIENT SUPPORT FOR THE ROYAL UNITED HOSPITAL BATH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income:
£1,370,962
Donations and legacies | £114.28k | |
Charitable activities | £1.21m | |
Other trading activities | £4.66k | |
Investments | £40.49k | |
Other | £48 |
Total expenditure:
£1,373,447
Raising funds | £83.48k | |
Charitable activities | £1.29m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £83.48k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.29m |
People

13 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
198 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 21 June 1978: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE RUH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ronald Michael Helvey | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Bryan | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David William Biggs | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Rymer | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Pierce | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Satterly | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Philip Addis | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|||||
JANE ELIZABETH RYMER | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £812.91k | £634.91k | £678.26k | £1.17m | £1.37m | |
|
Total expenditure | £609.89k | £501.50k | £594.46k | £1.11m | £1.37m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.52k | £48.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £136.53k | £243.98k | £67.18k | £137.72k | £114.28k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.39k | £1.44k | £735 | £5.26k | £4.66k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £626.22k | £389.05k | £609.61k | £1.01m | £1.21m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.84k | £432 | £459 | £18.72k | £40.49k | |
|
Income - Other | £41.93k | £0 | £280 | £25 | £48 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £121.25k | £180.36k | £55.50k | £123.50k | £101.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £547.26k | £450.26k | £518.49k | £1.04m | £1.29m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £61.15k | £51.23k | £75.97k | £69.12k | £83.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.59k | £5.74k | £6.56k | £12.67k | £18.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £7.56k | £47.52k | £0 | £283.27k | £381.32k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.48k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £13.84k | £77.05k | £63.53k | £50.19k | £45.45k | |
|
Long-term investments | £13.95k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.17m | £1.26m | £1.37m | £1.47m | £1.51m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £180.14k | £185.30k | £196.31k | £221.08k | £259.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 16 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED ON 05 JUL 2019 AMENDED ON 18 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS OF THE ROYAL UNITED HOSPITALS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Linked charities
- 21 June 1978 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRIENDS OF THE RUH
Royal United Hospitals
Combe Park
BATH
BA1 3NG
- Phone:
- 01225824046
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window