ST MARY'S EAST MOLESEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities are to renew the ministry of St Mary's Church by the provision of a broad range of Christian worship for the communities of East and West Molesey and beyond, the pastoral care of those in need specifically by reason of youth, ill health or bereavement, the maintenance and usage of St Mary' parish church and hall for the benefit of the congregation and community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 24 January 2019: Standard registration
- 18 January 2023: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 18 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1197566 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.59k | £13.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.01k | £25.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN EAST AND WEST MOLESEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF A BROAD RANGE OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP AND PASTORAL ACTIVITIES. • TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF EAST AND WEST MOLESEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window