Trustees THE STOURBRIDGE AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 511436

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Leon Nicholas Davies | Chair | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Miles | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Berrington | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beth Hemmings | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA LOUISE SIMPSON | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma-Louise Clifton | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN HUNT | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEANNE HUNT | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNA HOUGH | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM GREGORY | Trustee | 16 March 1995 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.