WIRRAL CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of community participation in sport through providing facilities for the playing of rugby union, football, cricket and other sports. Provision of volunteer led coaching in relation the above sports and organisation and management of teams to support participation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wirral
Governance
- 04 April 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN PAUL PHYTHIAN | Chair | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME ERIC ROBERTS | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steven James Harvey | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Noah Moran | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE CARROL | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
GARY WALTERS | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PHILIP PROCTER | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.29k | £115.65k | £215.51k | £231.45k | £192.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.39k | £91.96k | £152.27k | £186.78k | £220.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.06k | £65.86k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 November 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 November 2024 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 December 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 December 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CLUB IS ESTABLISHED ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL, CRICKET AND OTHER SPORTS (FACILITIES MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); (2) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rugby Club
Thornton Common Road
WIRRAL
CH63 0LT
- Phone:
- 07914804422
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window