CHAYAH DEVELOPMENT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance, relieve needs of and help young people up to the age of 30 living in Nottingham and the surrounding areas. by providing advice, assistance & services designed to: (a) develop skills, capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals. (b) advance education (c) Relieve Unemployment (d) Provide Recreational activities to improve social welfare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £41,540 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 11 December 2018: CIO registration
- CHAYAH DEVELOPMENT PROJECT CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KARINA SCOTT | Chair | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Ramowski | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mairead Stephanie Fisher | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sidione Rosemarie McLeod | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Yvonne May Francis-Parmar | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
CARL WHITE | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.22k | £175.27k | £189.88k | £190.62k | £118.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.96k | £176.00k | £190.78k | £173.26k | £124.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | £41.54k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE, RELIEVE NEEDS OF AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 30 LIVING IN NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY ACTING AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND PROVIDING ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND SERVICES DESIGNED TO: (A) DEVELOP SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (B) ADVANCE EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chayah Development Project
26 Robin Hood Chase
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 4EZ
- Phone:
- 01157524152
- Email:
- info@chayahgroup.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window