ROSMINI PUBLICATIONS LIMITED

Charity Number: 1178409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the Roman Catholic religion for the benefit of the public mainly, but not exclusively, by promoting the Roman Catholic religion through the ongoing translation, publication and dissemination of the teachings of Antonio Rosmini into the English language to enlighten others about the teachings of the Roman Catholic religion in accordance with the charism of Antonio Rosmini.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £45,024
Total expenditure: £58,255

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 May 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fr Joseph O'Reilly IC Chair 25 March 2022
ST ETHELDREDA TRUST
Received: On time
Fr Tom Thomas Trustee 06 January 2025
APOSTOLIC PREFECTURE OF THE FALKLANDS AND MISSION TO ST HELENA, TRISTAN DA CUNHA AND ASCENSION ISLAND CIO
Received: On time
CALVARIO LIMITED
Received: On time
INSTITUTE OF CHARITY
Received: On time
ST ETHELDREDA TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Antonio Belsito Trustee 19 May 2017
CALVARIO LIMITED
Received: On time
INSTITUTE OF CHARITY
Received: On time
APOSTOLIC MISSION TO ITALIAN EMIGRANTS IN GREAT BRITAIN
Charity reporting is overdue by 1670 days
Fr PETER WILFRED MULLEN Trustee 19 May 2017
CALVARIO LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £50.72k £40.49k £395.84k £43.44k £45.02k
Total expenditure £54.55k £40.47k £61.24k £57.82k £58.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cantor Fitzgerald House
23 St. Stephen's Green
Dublin 2
Phone:
+35316333826
Website:

No information available