BRITISH FORUM FOR ETHNOMUSICOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to advance the study of musical life in its full richness and diversity. It serves as a forum for cooperation between researchers, facilitating debate and exchange of knowledge through organising conferences and public events concerning music, sound and dance from all parts of the world. It publishes three issues a year of the journal Ethnomusicology Forum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 April 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. BYRON DUECK | Chair | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christina Homer | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amanda Villepastour | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Min Yen Ong | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cassandre Balosso-Bardin | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Thomas Machin-Autenrieth | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr RUARD WILLIAM ABSAROKA | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEPHEN WILFORD | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Tze Wan Wong | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.20k | £21.64k | £18.98k | £17.65k | £23.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.30k | £17.65k | £8.99k | £13.23k | £15.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION SHALL EXIST TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO MUSIC AND RELATED FIELDS THAT REFLECT THE RANGE OF INTERESTS OF THE BODY AND TO CARRY OUT THE SPIRIT OF RULE FIVE (THAT OF AFFILIATED NATIONAL COMMITTEE) OF THE CONSTITUTION OF THE INTERNATIONAL COUNCIL FOR TRADITIONAL MUSIC. FOR THOSE PURPOSES AND NOT OTHERWISE BFE SHALL HAVE POWER: (A) TO PROVIDE A FORUM IN WHICH INTERESTED PERSONS MAY SHARE IN THE FINDINGS OF RESEARCH AND ENGAGE IN DEBATE, BY ARRANGING MEETINGS, DISCUSSIONS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES; (B) TO PROVIDE AN OFFICIAL LINK FOR INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF BFE WITH THE ICTM AND TO SUBMIT REPORTS OF ITS ACTIVITIES TO THE ICTM; (C) TO ORGANISE AN ANNUAL CONFERENCE IN THE UK; (D) TO CO-OPERATE WITH OTHER BODIES IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTS TO THOSE OF BFE; (E) TO ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST WORK IN THE FIELD OF MUSIC AND RELATED RESEARCH THAT REFLECTS THE INTERESTS OF MEMBERS OF BFE; (F) TO PUBLISH REGULARLY A SCHOLARLY JOURNAL (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE JOURNAL') AND TO ISSUE REGULAR E-NEWS FOR MEMBERS AND NON-MEMBERS; (G) TO DO ALL SUCH THINGS AS WILL FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF BFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Prof. BYRON DUECK
MUSIC DEPARTMENT
OPEN UNIVERSITY
WALTON HALL
MILTON KEYNES
MK7 6AA
- Phone:
- 0300 303 5303
- Email:
- chair@bfe.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window