NORTHWICK PARK CARDIAC RESEARCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is based at Northwick Park Hospital in Harrow, Middx and our object is to promote and protect good health for the public benefit by carrying out medical research with the aim of finding new treatments for heart disease. We also research different methods of assessing the function of the heart. The results of our work are made public through peer reviewed publication and presentations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Harrow
Governance
- 29 March 2018: CIO registration
- 09 September 2020: Funds received from 1049092 PARK ROYAL CARDIAC RESEARCH
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NIGEL GRAHAM STEPHENS | Chair | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hugh Bethell | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sara Rawlins | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANN LEWIS | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr AHMED ELGHAMAZ | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr NAVTEJ CHAHAL | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £655.03k | £207.74k | £583.52k | £371.05k | £352.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £610.67k | £122.58k | £588.87k | £476.55k | £436.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.29k | N/A | £398.43k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £11.00k | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £578.59k | N/A | £185.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £64.16k | N/A | £83 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £610.67k | N/A | £588.87k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Mar 2018 as amended on 13 Feb 2020 as amended on 12 Jun 2023 as amended on 02 Aug 2023 as amended on 04 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
To promote and protect good health for the public benefit by carrying out medical research in particular but not exclusively into finding new treatments for heart disease, researching methods of assessing cardiac function and the development of interventional devices. To disseminate the results of such research for the public benefit. Offering education and training in the diagnosis, treatment and research of cardiac disease.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTHWICK PARK HOSPITAL
WATFORD ROAD
HARROW
HA1 3UJ
- Phone:
- 02088692547
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window