THE VICTORIA PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 511442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The community hall rents the hall to regular and occasional hirers. We have a wide range of activities suitable for all ages. Bingo, Tae Kwondo, Ballet, Tap, Musical Theatre, Drama, .WI. Baby Ballet Class, Cadoxton Nursery School, Cadoxton Primary School, Fetes, Parties, and general socialising.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £10,790
Total expenditure: £19,862

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Vale Of Glamorgan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 May 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MEGAN MERRETT BA, PGDIP Chair 11 September 2017
CADOG'S CORNER DEVELOPMENT GROUP
Received: On time
JANET CLARKE Trustee 21 August 2017
CADOG'S CORNER DEVELOPMENT GROUP
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.73k £30.95k £7.91k £13.63k £10.79k
Total expenditure £9.40k £12.14k £10.03k £9.95k £19.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.50k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 October 2024 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 October 2024 612 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 October 2024 977 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 October 2024 977 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 September 2024 1331 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
30 Main Street
Barry
CF63 2HJ
Phone:
01446401744
Website:

No information available