Wirral Fox Rescue

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wirral Fox Rescue, formally Pawprints, is Wirral's only dedicated centre for the rescue, rehabilitation and release of foxes. Through a combination of coordinated veterinary services and our excellent in house programme, we aim to nurse our foxes back to health before releasing them into the wild, preferably where they were first found.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- Wirral
Governance
- 26 January 2018: CIO registration
- PAWPRINTS (Working name)
- WIRRAL FOX RESCUE (Working name)
- PAWPRINTS - WIRRAL WILDLIFE RESCUE, REHABILITATION AND RELEASE (Previous name)
- PAWPRINTS WIRRAL WILDLIFE RESCUE, REHABILITATION AND RELEASE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raymond Bucknell | Chair | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Cross | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Shaw | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anwen Crompton | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Angela James Hunt | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dee Tully-Bucknell | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.14k | £67.93k | £78.53k | £93.94k | £92.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.71k | £66.13k | £81.49k | £90.89k | £96.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £50.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2023 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2023 | 260 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2023 | 625 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2023 | 625 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jan 2018 as amended on 15 Jul 2024 as amended on 15 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 1. TO FURTHER THE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION OF WILDLIFE, INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOXES WITHIN THE WIRRAL AND MERSEYSIDE AREA. 2. TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF WILDLIFE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY PROVIDING RESCUE, CARE AND REHABILITATION SERVICE FOR SICK, INJURED, OR ORPHANED WILDLIFE WITH THE AIM OF RELEASING SUCH ANIMALS BACK INTO THE WILD WHEREVER POSSIBLE. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF WILDLIFE, INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOXES AND THE CARE, METHODS OF TREATMENT, CONSERVATION AND HABITAT OF FOXES AND OTHER ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40b Carsthorne Road
Hoylake
Wirral
CH47 4FB
- Phone:
- 0151-317-8880
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window