VEERA TAMILAR MUNNANI UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping poor people in Srilanka and India
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- India
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 27 June 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GANESH JASOTHARAN | Chair | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEYARUBAN ULAGANATHAN | Trustee | 12 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
PARANIRUPASIGHAM KATHIRKAMANATHAN | Trustee | 12 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paramasamy Paskaran | Trustee | 09 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIVAAHHINIE JEGARATNAM | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.02k | £49.11k | £60.23k | £52.90k | £41.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.58k | £39.46k | £58.47k | £54.15k | £48.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
14 November 2024 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2021
(These accounts |
29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE NEEDY PEOPLE LIVING IN SRI LANKA AND INDIA INCLUDING: 1) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING; 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; 3) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY; 4) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Veera Tamilar Munnani UK
PO Box 1244
HARROW
HA1 9PN
- Phone:
- 07385599001
- Email:
- VTM_UK@YAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window