Accounts and annual returns RHANDIROEDD NANTPORTH ALLOTMENTS

Charity Number: 1179299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 March 2023 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 March 2023 40 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 April 2021 64 days late Download Open in new window