BLAZE ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of children and young people aged primarily between 12 and 25 by fostering and promoting, artistic and leadership skills, including but not exclusively by the provision of classes, seminars, workshops, performance opportunities and training courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 July 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jasleen Kaur | Chair | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hamza Jahanzeb | Trustee | 18 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Smith | Trustee | 18 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hattie Kongaunruan | Trustee | 18 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joe Clegg | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL TENNANT | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.71k | £74.00k | £77.55k | £117.46k | £103.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.25k | £71.50k | £86.46k | £91.04k | £107.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.25k | £10.88k | £2.20k | N/A | £15.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | £16.28k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 16 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED PRIMARILY BETWEEN 12 AND 25 IN THE ARTS BY FOSTERING AND PROMOTING, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF CLASSES, SEMINARS, WORKSHOPS, PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES AND TRAINING COURSES. 2) TO PROMOTE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS BY STAGING PUBLIC EVENTS, INCLUDING PERFORMANCES AND EXHIBITIONS OF WORK OF ARTISTIC MERIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Valley St Community Centre
Valley St
Burnley
Lancashire
BB11 5LZ
- Phone:
- 07928668734
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window