Financial history A LIFE FOR A CURE – RYAN BRESNAHAN’S MENINGITIS APPEAL

Charity number: 1179345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £52.07k £7.69k £4.25k £34.42k £12.55k
Total expenditure £18.77k £2.68k £2.15k £8.84k £3.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A