Financial history STRIKE A LIGHT (GLOUCESTER)

Charity number: 1178449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £531.60k £311.02k £702.57k £424.19k £490.25k
Total expenditure £456.17k £297.13k £647.50k £471.74k £436.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £229.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £7.47k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £524.01k N/A £702.57k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £456.17k N/A £647.50k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £250 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A