SAINTS COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Activities aim is to Inspire Communities through sport. Sport - To Provide and assist in facilities for sport, recreation and leisure time occupation. Aimed at the public at large in the interest of social welfare and with the object of improving physical and mental well being. Education - To advance the education of children, young people and adults through various community programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £177,100 from 2 government contract(s) and £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- St Helens
Governance
- 06 February 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPH NICHOLL | Chair | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Yeoman | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|||||
ANN MARIE NICHOLL | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ERIC CHISNALL | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN CHARLES WELLENS | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £349.52k | £260.18k | £332.65k | £318.74k | £456.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £362.62k | £192.33k | £340.91k | £303.22k | £574.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £30.00k | £30.00k | £95.21k | N/A | £177.10k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £131.41k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
4.THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS("OBJECTS")ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANTS OF ST HELENS AND MERSEYSIDE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS. 4.1. TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF RUGBY LEAGUE AND OTHER SPORTS (ÆFACILITIESÆ MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTS ACTIVITIES). 4.2. TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THE THEIR AGE, ETHNICITY, DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 4.3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Totally Wicked Stadium
McManus Drive
ST. HELENS
WA9 3AL
- Phone:
- 01744455084
- Email:
- scdf@saintsrlfc.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window