Trustees RIVERSIDE PRE-SCHOOL CIO

Charity Number: 1178444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Madaleine Richardson-Walters Trustee 18 April 2024
None on record
Miranda Poore Trustee 27 February 2024
None on record
Laura Jade Fry Trustee 17 January 2023
None on record
Tessa Louise Deans Trustee 08 February 2022
None on record
Rachael Gregory Trustee 16 November 2020
None on record
Joseph Hadfield Trustee 14 November 2018
None on record
Rebecca Reeves Trustee 21 May 2018
None on record
Michele Stride Trustee 21 May 2018
None on record
Rachel McNicol Trustee 21 May 2018
None on record