FELLOWSHIP AND AID TO THE CHRISTIANS OF THE EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FACE supports Eastern Christians, in particular those who suffer discrimination or persecution in the Middle East, through locally organised projects that enable them: to remain in their homelands; to maintain their homes, schools, churches & hospitals; to create employment opportunities; to promote interreligious dialogue; and to be mediators and peacemakers in their multi-faith communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bulgaria
- Cyprus
- Egypt
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Ethiopia
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- India
- Iraq
- Israel
- Italy
- Jordan
- Lebanon
- Romania
- Syria
- Turkey
- Ukraine
Governance
- 31 May 2018: CIO registration
- FACE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Fox | Chair | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dame Rachel de Souza DBE | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Philip Pelham Gibbons | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher Sayer MA, FCA | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Lupton MBBS, MA | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.12k | £262.48k | £280.23k | £89.66k | £130.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.30k | £156.66k | £215.55k | £89.82k | £110.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 31 MAY 2018 AMENDED ON 28 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS TO PEOPLE IN THE MIDDLE EAST, THE HORN OF AFRICA AND INDIA AND SURROUNDING TERRITORIES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO LOCAL ORGANISATIONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE UNDER THE PATRONAGE OF THE EASTERN CHURCHES; (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE MIDDLE EAST, THE HORN OF AFRICA AND INDIA AND SURROUNDING TERRITORIES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO PLACES OF LEARNING, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO THOSE UNDER THE PATRONAGE OF THE EASTERN CHURCHES; (3) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE MIDDLE EAST, THE HORN OF AFRICA AND INDIA, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SUPPORTING AND PROMOTING THE EASTERN CHURCHES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN PLACES WHERE CHRISTIANS ARE SUFFERING FROM PERSECUTION, OPPRESSION OR DISCRIMINATION. (4) TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE, MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING, TOLERANCE AND RESPECT BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS IN THE MIDDLE EAST, THE HORN OF AFRICA AND INDIA AND SURROUNDING TERRITORIES, BY FACILITATING ECUMENICAL AND INTERRELIGIOUS RELATIONS; AND (5) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION AND THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES WHICH PROMOTE A GREATER AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE EASTERN CHURCHES, AND WHICH STRENGTHEN PASTORAL BONDS BETWEEN EASTERN AND WESTERN CHRISTIANS.?
Contact information
- Address:
-
FACE Charity
Judge Sykes Frixou
Queen's House
55 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London
WC2A 3LJ
- Phone:
- 07587353655
- Email:
- info@facecharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window