LANCASTER AND MORECAMBE MODEL ENGINEERING SOCIETY (2018)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A model engineering society based at Cinderbarrow Picnic site at Yealand Redmayne, Carnforth, Lancashire where run a Miniature Railway that is open to the public for rides on Sundays from spring to autumn. We aim to develop a interest in engineering in miniature by our activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 24 January 2018: CIO registration
- LANCASTER AND MORECAMBE MODEL ENGINEERING SOCIETY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Mark Brown | Chair | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Pearson | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Pengelly | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin John Pearson | Trustee | 11 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Livesley | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Howard McQuire | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN DIXON | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW STEWART DUNN | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Christopher Wood | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
BEVIS MULHOLLAND | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JAMES WILSON | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.95k | £16.36k | £13.70k | £21.15k | £17.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.87k | £20.27k | £18.38k | £24.87k | £12.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENGINEERING THROUGH THE CONSTRUCTION AND OPERATION OF MODELS OF ENGINEERING, THE PROVISION OF TALKS, PUBLIC EXHIBITIONS, DEMONSTRATIONS AND BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR CONSTRUCTION, DEVELOPMENT AND RUNNING ENGINEERING MODELS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 NAWORTH DRIVE
CARLISLE
CA3 0DD
- Phone:
- 01228520910
- Email:
- secretary@lmmes.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window