Financial history BARBAROS ENSEMBLE

Charity number: 1177956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £12.02k £13.02k £22.94k £35.25k
Total expenditure £2.51k £1.08k £20.00k £26.36k £29.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A