DISTRESS SUPPORT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of those in need, by reason of age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage, through the provision of free legal advice, assistance and support to persons who, through lack of means, would otherwise be unable to obtain such. The Distress Support Foundation supplies advice, assistance and support in all areas of the English Legal System.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN ROBERT BERKELEY | Chair | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.85k | £28.33k | £32.48k | £23.24k | £11.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.75k | £35.68k | £31.63k | £29.30k | £12.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 153 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FREE LEGAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS WHO, THROUGH LACK OF MEANS, WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A Standmoor Court
Park Lane
Whitefield
MANCHESTER
M45 7PF
- Phone:
- 07970 291197
- Email:
- berkeleyadrian@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window