Accounts and annual returns GRACE EMBASSY

Charity number: 1178477
Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
Annual return 30 March 2023 07 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2022 07 October 2023 250 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2021 07 October 2023 615 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2020 07 October 2023 980 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2020 Not Required