THE GRENFELL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Grenfell Foundation was set up to listen to those needs & to provide long term, bespoke support to the survivors, bereaved & the community. That began with helping to ensure & provide funding for a community-led, appropriate anniversary. It continues in its attempts to encourage social cohesion & health, provide community space & activities & facilitate education & advocacy, for years to come.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 March 2018: Standard registration
- GRENFELL FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Richards | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Diane Dolton | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jenita Rahman | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Joseph | Trustee | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.24k | £637.45k | £74.53k | £97.63k | £181.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £340.60k | £222.74k | £269.09k | £252.40k | £235.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.00k | £17.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £637.45k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £222.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £37.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAR 2018 as amended on 14 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE GRENFELL FOUNDATION (THE "FOUNDATION") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1) TO BENEFIT THE FORMER RESIDENTS OF THE GRENFELL TOWER AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS, FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS, AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS; 2) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, CARE AND OTHER FORMS OF PERSONAL SUPPORT; 3) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION BY RAISING AWARENESS OF ANY LESSONS LEARNED FROM THE GRENFELL TOWER TRAGEDY WITH A VIEW TO ENSURING THAT, AS FAR AS POSSIBLE, NO SIMILAR TRAGEDY OR TRAGEDIES TAKE PLACE IN THE FUTURE; 4) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE AND INTEGRATE FULLY IN SOCIETY; 5) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE LIFELONG LEARNING, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SKILLS TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT; 6) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO BUILD CAPACITY AND BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEIR INTEGRATION INTO AND PARTICIPATION IN WIDER SOCIETY; AND 7) TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND WHICH ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES COMPLEMENTARY TO THE FOREGOING OBJECTS, IN EACH CASE, WITHOUT LIMITING THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES OR THE POTENTIAL SCOPE OF THE FOREGOING OBJECTS, WITH AN EXPECTED FOCUS ON THE SURVIVORS OF THE GRENFELL TOWER TRAGEDY AND OF FORMER RESIDENTS OF GRENFELL TOWER AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS AND THOSE WHO HAVE SUFFERED BEREAVEMENT AS A RESULT OF THE TRAGEDY, AS WELL AS THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, AND WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4B Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
LONDON
E2 7PR
- Phone:
- 020 7613 5589
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window