MOUNTAIN MOVERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating in South Wales, we provide access/signposting to services and inclusive educational, sporting, arts & social opportunities. Through our partnership with the Prince's Trust, our young people can develop qualifications that offer flexibility, choice and pathways to progression. We primarily support families who are home-educating at least one child with a disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
Total income includes £2,157 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 17 January 2018: CIO registration
- 07 June 2022: Funds received from 1164016 HOME EDUCATION BARRY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Ann Tuck | Chair | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Victoria Morgan | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Evans | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/06/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.43k | £15.58k | £17.45k | £9.64k | £5.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.19k | £15.75k | £9.67k | £10.80k | £8.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | £2.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 54 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 54 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 152 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN WHO ARE BEING EDUCATED OTHERWISE THAN AT SCHOOL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THOSE CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES. THOUGH CO-OPERATIVE LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES, ENRICHMENT ARTS AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES. ENABLING THE CHILDREN TO PARTICIPATE AS FULLY AS POSSIBLE IN SOCIETY WITH A POSITIVE SENSE OF COMMUNITY AND BELONGING. TO REDUCE SOCIAL ISOLATION OF BOTH THE CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES BY PROVIDING A REGULAR SAFE AND CONFIDENTIAL SETTING TO ALLOW THE DEVELOPMENT OF SOCIAL SKILLS AS WELL AS PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE AND SIGNPOSTING TO ADDITIONAL SERVICES. TO IMPROVE THE SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE OF PARENT/CARERS WHO HAVE TAKEN LEGAL RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE EDUCATION OF THEIR CHILD(REN) THROUGH THE PROVIDING OF ACCESS TO TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT SO THEY ARE BETTER EQUIPPED TO EDUCATED THEIR CHILD(REN) IN A ROUNDED AND INFORMED MANNER. TO REDUCE POVERTY AND EASE THE FINANCIAL BURDEN FACED BY FAMILIES WHO TAKE LEGAL RESPONSIBILITY FOR EDUCATING THEIR CHILD(REN) THROUGH THE FACILITATION OF EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES AND TRAINING AS WELL AS THE SHARING OF EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES. TO PROMOTE GREATER UNDERSTANDING OF ELECTIVE HOME EDUCATION WITH THE AIM TO REDUCE HOSTILITY AND THE ASSOCIATED ISOLATION FOR THIS MINORITY GROUP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Pisgah Street
Kenfig Hill
BRIDGEND
Mid Glamorgan
CF33 6BY
- Phone:
- 07921 182654
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window