KINGDOM CROWN CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a friendly and vibrant Church passionate about the gospel of Jesus Christ and the Christian Faith. We are actively involved in our local community and city, undertaking charitable activities, and working in partnership for the well being of the members of our community, including young people, families and the vulnerable and disadvantaged. We engage in Evangelism and Christian seminars.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH NYAMEKYE | Chair | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
NAOMI MUSUSA | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
HENREY BROWN KWAKYE | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.72k | £4.43k | £2.63k | £1.03k | £2.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.02k | £4.65k | £3.10k | £980 | £3.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 May 2023 | 308 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 May 2023 | 308 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 May 2023 | 673 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 May 2023 | 673 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 May 2023 | 1038 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 May 2023 | 1038 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 PEVENSEY CLOSE
SOUTHAMPTON
SO16 9HF
- Phone:
- 07574163279
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window