THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, ST HELIER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the Parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £25,020 from 1 government contract(s) and £24,327 from 6 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 25 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucas Marlow | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Humphreys | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Syd Coy | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Marlow | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Coy | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Farr | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
TRACY MARLOW | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.66k | £18.44k | £72.94k | £98.02k | £109.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.42k | £36.47k | £56.32k | £78.98k | £109.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.02k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 December 2020 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 December 2020 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. PETERS C OF E CHURCH
BISHOPSFORD ROAD
MORDEN
SM4 6BH
- Phone:
- 02086486050
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window