Financial history BRIGHTWELLS GOSTREY CENTRE

Charity number: 1176651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £225.51k £249.53k £172.64k £202.53k £224.86k
Total expenditure £256.32k £247.08k £174.56k £243.38k £240.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £35.00k
Income from government grants N/A £65.00k N/A £35.00k £35.00k