Financial history INTEGRITY INTERNATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1176502
Charity reporting is up to date (103 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £58.84k £17.53k £36.40k £37.08k £45.16k
Total expenditure £53.99k £33.47k £28.41k £11.35k £21.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A