NEW LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH BOSTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
New Life Community Church actively teaches the Christian Faith and is involved in the community of Boston. We run a CAP Debt Centre and courses on Money Management. Our work with children, young families and the older generation is reflected in running Little MIracles Parent & Toddler Group, Kidz Klub and Over 60's Friendship Group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,167 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
- Greece
Governance
- 13 June 2018: CIO registration
- 14 March 2019: Funds received from 513580 NEW LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH, BOSTON
- NEW LIFE FELLOWSHIP BOSTON (OLD NAME) (Working name)
- NEW LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH, BOSTON (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEAL MUGGLESTONE | Chair | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robyn Marie King | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin Godfrey Sore | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Stimson | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Smith | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ADRIAN CREASEY | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.40k | £115.95k | £118.03k | £140.94k | £167.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.87k | £55.02k | £64.02k | £71.15k | £69.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.17k | £15.17k | £5.17k | £5.17k | £5.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE:- 4.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; 4.2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED BY REASON OF HARDSHIP, ILLNESS OR VULNERABILITY; AND 4.3. THE PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AT ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEW LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH
THE JUNCTION
WASH ROAD
KIRTON
BOSTON
PE20 1QJ
- Phone:
- 01205724542
- Email:
- office@nlccboston.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window