FLAT IRON FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Flat Iron Fund is a grant-making charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 May 2018: CIO registration
- THE FLAT IRON FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLIE CARROLL | Chair | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE ELIZABETH CARROLL | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN WILLIAM ANDERSON | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £240.52k | £0 | £144.41k | £297.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £210.37k | £5.88k | £136.19k | £274.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 16 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED ON 13 AUG 2019 AMENDED ON 21 DEC 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE: 3.1 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SUFFERING, INCLUDING BY SUPPORTING INTERNATIONAL RELIEF AND CRISIS ALLEVIATION; 3.2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, BOTH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL, AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH; 3.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; 3.4 THE PROMOTION OF RURAL OR URBAN REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION; 3.5 THE PROMOTION OF CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND 3.6 THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION, BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, SOCIALLY EXCLUDED MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; OR ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broadfield Law UK
One Bartholomew Close
LONDON
EC1A 7BL
- Phone:
- 02077833568
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window