ALNOOR CULTURAL & EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
5 DAILY PRAYERS, FRIDAY PRAYERS, TARAWIYH, EID PRAYERS, EID CELEBRATIONS, FUNERALS, FUNDRAISING, MADRASSAH, LECTURES, WEDDINGS, YOUTH PROGRAMMES, ADULT PROGRAMMES, TUITION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £625 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
Governance
- 21 February 2018: CIO registration
- 20 December 2018: Funds received from 1118963 ALNOOR CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST
- ALNOOR C&ET (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDALLAH SAID OTHMAN | Chair | 24 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Omar Salim Awadh | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAUD JUNEJA | Trustee | 24 September 2017 |
|
|||||
MBARAK HUSSEIN MBARAK | Trustee | 24 September 2017 |
|
|||||
FARIDA MOHAMMED ALLY | Trustee | 24 September 2017 |
|
|||||
ALI NASSOR ALI | Trustee | 24 September 2017 |
|
|||||
MBARAK HASSAN ALLY | Trustee | 24 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
FATMA A SAID | Trustee | 24 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Salim Ali | Trustee | 24 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ASHA SAEED ABDALLAH | Trustee | 24 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.80k | £117.37k | £196.08k | £241.44k | £233.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.11k | £131.31k | £133.13k | £186.84k | £199.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.87k | £11.50k | N/A | £625 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) ARE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND MORE PARTICULARLY IN LONDON AND IN THE UNITED KINGDOM: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE FAITH AND RELIGIOUS PRACTICES OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE QURÆAN AND THE SUNNAH AMONGST MUSLIMS IN PARTICULAR AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT CONCERNING THE TEACHINGS AND PRACTICES OF ISLAM; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES; (E) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF ANY PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR NATIONALITY, RACE, ETHNIC ORIGIN AND RELIGIOUS BELIEFS; (F) THE ADVANCEMENT OF BOTH RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (I) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE OF AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL GROUPS; (II) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL GROUPS IN ORDER TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS BELONGING TO DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL GROUPS; (III) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RELIGION AND RACE; AND (G) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT THESE ARE IN HARMONY WITH THE QURÆAN AND THE SUNNAH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MASJID ALNOOR
ALNOOR CULTURAL & EDUCATIONAL TRUST
170 GASCOIGNE ROAD
BARKING
IG11 7LH
- Phone:
- 02085943100
- Email:
- alnoor@alnoorcet.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window