ANGELS 4 DOGS RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the public to relieve the suffering of animals in need of care and attention and in particular to provide and maintain rescue homes for the care and treatment of such animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 April 2018: CIO registration
- ANGELS 4 ANIMALS RESCUE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YASMINE MOSS | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRACE MAXTED | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE MOSS | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.67k | £110.26k | £56.98k | £54.97k | £96.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.53k | £109.86k | £50.33k | £52.45k | £94.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 05 December 2022 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 05 December 2022 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. 2) THE PROVISION OF FREE MEDICAL OR SURGICAL TREATMENT, OR SUCH TREATMENT AT REDUCED CHARGES, TO ANIMALS BELONGING TO PERSONS WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD THE SERVICES OF A VETERINARY SURGEON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 CRESCENT ROAD
BIRCHINGTON
CT7 9DP
- Phone:
- 07808868689
- Email:
- info@angels4dogs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window